Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF549 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 24, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill March 14, 2023