Senate | 04/04/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2424. S.J. 750. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2024 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2024 12:00PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Dickey, Dawson, and Petersen. S.J. 61. | ||
Senate | 12/31/2023 | END OF [] ACTIONS | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1092. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 680. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 679. |