Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1079.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 1027.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 88, nays 2. H.J. 1024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1024.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1353, yeas 33, nays 57. H.J. 1023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Point of order raised on amendment H-1353, ruled not germane. H.J. 1023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Substituted for HF 725. H.J. 1023.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment H-1353 filed. H.J. 1018.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 982.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 976.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment S-3207 filed, adopted. S.J. 1015.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 735.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 733.
|
|
|