Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1067.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 1013.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 59, nays 33. H.J. 1012.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment H-1362, yeas 35, nays 58, filed, lost. H.J. 1011.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Substituted for HF 731. H.J. 1010.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 1005.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 1004.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1051.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 32, nays 16. S.J. 1050.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment S-3222 adopted, as amended. S.J. 1050.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment S-3224 to S-3222 filed, adopted. S.J. 1050.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Amendment S-3222 filed. S.J. 1049.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 736.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 734.
|
|
|