Senate | 03/21/2024 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2415. S.J. 615. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2024 8:30AM Room 315. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2024 | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Bousselot, and Dotzler. S.J. 61. | ||
Senate | 12/31/2023 | END OF [] ACTIONS | ||
Senate | 06/05/2023 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1092. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2023 | Amendment S-3121 filed. S.J. 769. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 743. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 743. |