Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Correction approved. S.J. 962.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2024
|
Corrected version of enrolled bill. S.J. 965.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 962.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 804.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Immediate message. S.J. 842.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 838.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
Senate concurred with S-5057. S.J. 838.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Message from House, with amendment S-5057. S.J. 462.
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2024
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 554.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Immediate message. H.J. 534.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Passed House, yeas 89, nays 4. H.J. 532.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-8104, yeas 33, nays 59, lost. H.J. 531.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-8098, yeas 33, nays 60, lost. H.J. 530.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-8109, yeas 33, nays 60, lost. H.J. 529.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-1368 withdrawn. H.J. 529.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Committee amendment H-8047 adopted, as amended. H.J. 528.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-8097 to amendment H-8047 withdrawn. H.J. 528.
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
Amendment H-8151 to amendment H-8047 adopted. H.J. 528.
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
Amendment H-8151 filed. H.J. 510.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendments H-8104 and H-8109 filed. H.J. 454.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2024
|
Amendments H-8097 and H-8098 filed. H.J. 453.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 398.
|
|
|
House
|
02/26/2024
|
Committee amendment H-8047 filed. H.J. 398.
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2024
|
Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 398.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2024
|
Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2024
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 3:00PM House Lounge.
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2024
|
Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bloomingdale and Isenhart. H.J. 132.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Rereferred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1030.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment H-1368 filed. H.J. 1036.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 1033.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1033.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 05/03/2023 7:30PM.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Isenhart and Lundgren. H.J. 1016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1006.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 1005.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 1053.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 2. S.J. 1052.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Fiscal note.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 944.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 942.
|
|
|