Senate
|
06/01/2023
|
Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
NOBA: Final
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Message from House. S.J. 1035.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Immediate message. H.J. 977.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed House, yeas 94, nays 1. H.J. 964.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 957.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
NOBA: House Full Approps
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
NOBA: House Sub
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 918.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 918.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 04/27/2023 9:00AM RM 304.1.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Subcommittee: Bossman, Wood and Zabner. H.J. 912.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 911.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 910.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Floor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Immediate message. S.J. 961.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 959.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
NOBA: Senate Full Approps
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 942.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 942.
|
|
|