Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session

Iowa Senate Bill SF62 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/11/2023

                            Senate File 62 - Introduced   SENATE FILE 62   BY PETERSEN , WEINER , CELSI ,   TRONE GARRIOTT , BOULTON ,   DOTZLER , JOCHUM , QUIRMBACH ,   T. TAYLOR , DONAHUE , KNOX ,   BENNETT , WINCKLER , GIDDENS ,   BISIGNANO , and WAHLS   A BILL FOR   An Act relating to the state child care assistance eligibility 1   requirements and provider reimbursement rates. 2   BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF THE STATE OF IOWA: 3   TLSB 1491XS (5) 90   dg/rh  

  S.F. 62   Section 1. DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES  CHILD 1   CARE ASSISTANCE  FAMILY INCOME ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS. 2   1. The department of health and human services shall amend 3   its administrative rules pursuant to chapter 17A to provide 4   income eligibility for state child care assistance, according 5   to family size for children needing basic care, to families 6   whose nonexempt gross monthly income does not exceed the 7   following amounts according to the following schedule: 8   a. One hundred fifty percent of the federal poverty level, 9   effective July 1, 2023. 10   b. One hundred sixty percent of the federal poverty level, 11   effective July 1, 2024. 12   c. One hundred seventy percent of the federal poverty level, 13   effective July 1, 2025. 14   d. One hundred eighty percent of the federal poverty level, 15   effective July 1, 2026. 16   e. One hundred ninety percent of the federal poverty level, 17   effective July 1, 2027. 18   f. Two hundred percent of the federal poverty level, 19   effective July 1, 2028. 20   2. The department of health and human services shall amend 21   its administrative rules pursuant to chapter 17A to provide 22   that child care assistance under the child care assistance 23   plus exit eligibility program shall continue until a familys 24   nonexempt gross monthly income exceeds two hundred fifty 25   percent of the federal poverty level. 26   3. For the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2023, for child 27   care providers reimbursed under the state child care assistance 28   program, the department of health and human services shall set 29   provider reimbursement rates based on the most recent market 30   rate survey completed in 2021. 31   Sec. 2. EMERGENCY RULES. The department of health and 32   human services may adopt emergency rules under section 17A.4, 33   subsection 3, and section 17A.5, subsection 2, paragraph b, 34   to implement the provisions of this Act and the rules shall 35   -1-   LSB 1491XS (5) 90   dg/rh   1/ 2  

  S.F. 62   be effective immediately upon filing unless a later date is 1   specified in the rules. Any rules adopted in accordance with 2   this section shall also be published as a notice of intended 3   action as provided in section 17A.4. 4   EXPLANATION 5   The inclusion of this explanation does not constitute agreement with 6   the explanations substance by the members of the general assembly. 7   This bill relates to the state child care assistance income 8   eligibility requirements for families and reimbursement rates 9   for child care providers. 10   The state child care assistance program is administered by 11   the department of health and human services (HHS). The bill 12   directs HHS to amend its administrative rules to provide income 13   eligibility for state child care assistance, according to 14   family size for children needing basic care, to families whose 15   nonexempt gross monthly income does not exceed 150 percent 16   of the federal poverty level, effective July 1, 2023; 160 17   percent of the federal poverty level, effective July 1, 2024; 18   170 percent of the federal poverty level, effective July 1, 19   2025; 180 percent of the federal poverty level, effective July 20   1, 2026; 190 percent of the federal poverty level, effective 21   July 1, 2027; and 200 percent of the federal poverty level, 22   effective July 1, 2028. The bill also directs HHS to amend 23   its administrative rules to provide that eligibility for the 24   child care assistance plus exit program shall continue until a 25   familys nonexempt gross monthly income exceeds 250 percent of 26   the federal poverty level. 27   The bill directs HHS, for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 28   2023, to set reimbursement rates for child care providers under 29   the state child care assistance program to rates based on the 30   most recent market rate survey completed in 2021. 31   -2-   LSB 1491XS (5) 90   dg/rh   2/ 2