Senate | 03/02/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as []. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Tabled until future meeting. []. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2023 11:00AM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2023 2:30PM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Tabled until future meeting. []. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/13/2023 11:00AM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2023 | Tabled until future meeting. []. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/08/2023 11:00AM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, Boulton, Bousselot, and Webster. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Introduced, referred to State Government. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |