Senate | 03/09/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 550. | ||
Senate | 02/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 02/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2023 3:30PM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2023 | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Dotzler, Driscoll, Jochum, and Koelker. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Subcommittee: Dawson, Driscoll, Jochum, Koelker, and Winckler. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |