Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 574. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/22/2023 3:00PM Room G15. | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | Subcommittee reassigned: Dawson, Dotzler, Driscoll, Koelker, and Quirmbach. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, Driscoll, Koelker, and Quirmbach. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. | ||
Senate | 02/15/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |