Senate | 04/24/2023 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 576. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2023 | NOBA: Senate Sub | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/20/2023 11:30AM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Subcommittee: Koelker, Kraayenbrink, and Petersen. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |