LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Iowa IA
Legislatures
2023-2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SSB3031
Action History
IA
Iowa Senate Bill SSB3031
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Iowa 2023-2024 Regular Session
Iowa Senate Bill SSB3031
Action History
Senate
01/31/2024
Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2207.
Senate
01/30/2024
Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Senate
01/25/2024
Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room.
Senate
01/16/2024
Subcommittee: Gruenhagen, Alons, and Dotzler.
Senate
01/10/2024
Introduced, referred to Agriculture.
Senate
01/10/2024
By COMMITTEE ON AGRICULTURE