Senate | 04/28/2025 | NOBA: House Floor | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Read first time, attached to SF 630. S.J. 886. | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 1069. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 0. H.J. 1062. | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Amendment H-1275 adopted. H.J. 1062. | ||
House | 04/23/2025 | NOBA: House Full Approps | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Amendment H-1275 filed. H.J. 1036. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 04/17. |