House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 761. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 17. Nays, 6. H.J. 446. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 446. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2025 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/03/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/04/2025 8:00AM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee: Jones, Cooling and Wulf. H.J. 140. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 130. |