House
|
04/10/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 748.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 748.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 680.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2025 11:15AM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2025 3:30PM Room 217 Conference Room.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Subcommittee: Westrich, Bisignano, and Campbell. S.J. 493.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2025
|
Referred to State Government. S.J. 442.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Read first time, passed on file. S.J. 336.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2025
|
Message from House. S.J. 336.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 401.
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 387.
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 259.
|
|
|