House | 04/17/2025 | Withdrawn. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 1008. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 24. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 922. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 922. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/29/2025 12:00PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/23/2025 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Wichtendahl and Wills, J. H.J. 122. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 42. |