Senate | 04/16/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/16/2025 8:00AM Lobbyist Lounge. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Subcommittee: Green, Driscoll, and Townsend. S.J. 780. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 720. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: []. | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2025 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Subcommittee: Evans, Shipley, and Winckler. S.J. 507. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Read first time, referred to Education. S.J. 458. | ||
Senate | 03/10/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 458. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 590. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Passed House, yeas 88, nays 1. H.J. 588. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 278. |