Senate | 03/12/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/12/2025 1:30PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Petersen, and Warme. S.J. 421. | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 337. | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 337. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 401. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 396. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Amendment H-1016 adopted. H.J. 396. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Amendment H-1016 filed. H.J. 372. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 279. |