House
|
04/18/2025
|
Signed by Governor. H.J. 04/18.
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 989.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2025
|
Message from Senate. H.J. 925.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Immediate message. S.J. 753.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 749.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2025
|
Amendment S-3091 filed, lost. S.J. 749.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Placed on calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2025
|
Committee report, recommending passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2025
|
Subcommittee recommends passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Subcommittee Meeting: 03/25/2025 1:30PM Senate Lounge.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Subcommittee: Shipley, Petersen, and Rowley. S.J. 567.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 494.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2025
|
Message from House. S.J. 494.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Message from House.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Immediate message. H.J. 607.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 596.
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2025
|
Amendment H-1048 adopted. H.J. 596.
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Amendment H-1048 filed. H.J. 591.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2025
|
Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 306.
|
|
|