House | 04/18/2025 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 04/18. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 919. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 727. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 1. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Substituted for SF 287. S.J. 722. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 688. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Read first time, attached to SF 287. S.J. 494. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 494. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 638. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 607. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Passed House, yeas 91, nays 0. H.J. 597. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Amendment H-1049 adopted. H.J. 597. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Amendment H-1049 filed. H.J. 591. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 306. |