Senate | 03/25/2025 | Subcommittee: Dawson, Blake, and Schultz. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 606. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 606. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 767. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Passed House, yeas 89, nays 0. H.J. 761. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 415. |