House | 04/18/2025 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 04/18. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 989. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 920. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 727. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 721. | ||
Senate | 04/08/2025 | Substituted for SF 149. S.J. 721. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 688. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Read first time, attached to SF 149. S.J. 540. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 540. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 656. | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 646. | ||
House | 02/28/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 473. |