House | 04/28/2025 | Withdrawn. H.J. 1072. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 1028. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas 24. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 949. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 949. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2025 8:30AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Subcommittee: Bergan, Mohr, G. and Nielsen. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 514. |