House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 1014. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas 23. Nays, 1. Excused, 1. H.J. 950. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 949. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/19/2025 8:30AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Bergan and Brown-Powers. H.J. 677. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 514. |