Senate | 04/02/2025 | Subcommittee returns the bill to Committee without recommendation. []. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2025 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee: Warme, Garrett, and Petersen. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 623. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Read first time, referred to Health and Human Services. S.J. 623. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/24/2025 | Amendment H-1052 adopted. H.J. 03/24. | ||
House | 03/10/2025 | Amendment H-1052 filed. H.J. 591. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 522. |