Senate | 03/24/2025 | Subcommittee: Klimesh, Koelker, and Townsend. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Read first time, referred to Transportation. S.J. 602. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 602. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Amendment H-1125 adopted. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/18/2025 | Amendment H-1125 filed. H.J. 03/18. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 561. |