House | 04/18/2025 | Signed by Governor. H.J. 1011. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President, and sent to Governor. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/10/2025 | Message from Senate. H.J. 04/10. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Immediate message. S.J. 748. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 746. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Substituted for SF 587. S.J. 745. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 689. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Read first time, attached to SF 587. S.J. 603. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 603. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 563. |