Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 758. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. | ||
Senate | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2025 10:00AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Subcommittee: Dawson, Bisignano, and Lofgren. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 603. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 603. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Passed House, yeas 95, nays 1. H.J. 03/19. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 564. |