Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2025 8:30AM Room 217 Conference Room. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dotzler, and Schultz. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 607. | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Read first time, referred to Workforce. S.J. 607. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/20. | ||
House | 03/20/2025 | Passed House, yeas 87, nays 2. H.J. 03/20. | ||
House | 03/19/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 03/07/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 567. |