House | 04/28/2025 | Withdrawn. H.J. 1072. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 1016. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas 24. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 950. | ||
House | 04/16/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 950. | ||
House | 04/09/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/09/2025 8:00AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Subcommittee: Bergan, Bossman and Wilburn. H.J. 04/08. | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Introduced, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 593. |