Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2025 10:00AM Senate Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee: Reichman, Evans, and Quirmbach. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 663. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Passed House, yeas 84, nays 9. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Amendment H-1209 adopted. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Amendment H-1209 filed. H.J. 03/26. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 03/12. |