Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Blake, and Webster. S.J. 673. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Bousselot, Blake, and Webster. S.J. 673. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Blake, and Webster. S.J. 665. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Read first time, referred to Commerce. S.J. 658. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Message from House. S.J. 658. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/26. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Passed House, yeas 82, nays 12. H.J. 839. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 03/12. |