Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 758. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Amendment S-3065 filed. S.J. 696. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Placed on calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2025 12:00PM Senate Lounge. | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Subcommittee: Webster, Sires, and Weiner. | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Read first time, referred to Local Government. S.J. 663. | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Passed House, yeas 61, nays 32. H.J. 03/27. | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 03/12. |