Senate | 04/28/2025 | Subcommittee: Costello, Donahue, and Warme. S.J. 915. | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. S.J. 862. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 1033. | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Passed House, yeas 92, nays 0. H.J. 1016. | ||
House | 04/03/2025 | NOBA: House Full Approps | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 03/27. |