Senate | 04/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dotzler, and Schultz. S.J. 858. | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Dotzler, and Schultz. | ||
Senate | 04/21/2025 | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 832. | ||
Senate | 04/17/2025 | Message from House. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Immediate message. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Explanation of vote. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Passed House, yeas 74, nays 19. H.J. 04/17. | ||
House | 04/08/2025 | Fiscal note. | ||
House | 04/07/2025 | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 04/07. |