House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 7. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 13. Nays, 8. H.J. 298. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 298. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2025 12:30PM RM 304. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee: Fisher, Gjerde and Wulf. H.J. 105. | ||
House | 01/14/2025 | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 38. |