House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HJR 11. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 13. Nays, 10. H.J. 445. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 445. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2025 8:00AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Jones and Zabner. H.J. 280. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 252. |