House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 789. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 14. Nays, 9. H.J. 466. | ||
House | 02/27/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 466. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2025 12:30PM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Subcommittee: Gehlbach, Madison and Shipley. H.J. 172. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 169. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |