House | 03/11/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 913. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. Excused, 2. H.J. 533. | ||
House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 533. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/05/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2025 12:30PM RM 19. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Subcommittee: Hora, Dunwell and Wilburn. H.J. 172. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 170. | ||
House | 01/30/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |