House | 02/10/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 317. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 19. Nays, 1. Excused, 1. H.J. 270. | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 270. | ||
House | 01/27/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/27/2025 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Subcommittee: Lohse, Olson and Thompson, M. H.J. 83. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 78. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |