House | 03/05/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 781. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 19. Nays, 3. Excused, 1. H.J. 429. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 429. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/18/2025 12:00PM RM 19. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Harris and Scheetz. H.J. 292. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 288. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |