House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 857. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 23. Nays, 0. H.J. 525. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 525. | ||
House | 02/26/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/26/2025 11:45AM RM 304. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2025 1:30PM House Lounge (Cancelled). | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee: Nordman, Johnson, R. and Latham. H.J. 292. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Introduced, referred to Commerce. H.J. 288. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |