House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 651. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 20. Nays, 0. Excused, 1. H.J. 436. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 435. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2025 12:00PM House Lounge. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Subcommittee: Smith, Henderson and McBurney. H.J. 292. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Introduced, referred to Local Government. H.J. 288. | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON LOCAL GOVERNMENT |