House | 02/12/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 363. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. H.J. 137. | ||
House | 01/28/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 137. | ||
House | 01/21/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/21/2025 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Subcommittee: Dunwell, Nordman and Srinivas. H.J. 83. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 78. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |