House | 02/28/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 649. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 0. H.J. 434. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 434. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2025 10:30AM House Lounge 2. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Subcommittee: Thompson, M., Fett and Wilburn. H.J. 342. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 340. | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |