House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 843. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 13. Nays, 8. H.J. 509. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 509. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/19/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2025 12:30PM RM 304. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Subcommittee: Wulf, Collins and Scholten. H.J. 349. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | Introduced, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 347. | ||
House | 02/18/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON NATURAL RESOURCES |