House | 03/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 858. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 23. Nays, 0. H.J. 530. | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 530. | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 02/24/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2025 8:00AM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Subcommittee: Stone, Gjerde and Kniff McCulla. H.J. 408. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Introduced, referred to Education. H.J. 402. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION |