House | 01/30/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 177. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 21. Nays, 2. H.J. 146. | ||
House | 01/29/2025 | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 146. | ||
House | 01/22/2025 | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. | ||
House | 01/16/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/22/2025 7:00AM House Lounge. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Subcommittee: Wills, J., Brown-Powers and Wengryn. H.J. 83. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 79. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |