House | 04/07/2025 | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 995. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee vote: Yeas, 23. Nays, 1. Excused, 1. H.J. 890. | ||
House | 04/02/2025 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 890. | ||
House | 03/27/2025 | Subcommittee recommends passage. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/27/2025 12:00PM RM 304.1. | ||
House | 03/26/2025 | Subcommittee reassigned: Young, Bloomingdale and Judge. H.J. 03/26. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Judge and Nordman. H.J. 409. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 405. | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |